U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00142
  • Case Name: Olinger v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
December, 2018
  • December 24, 2018: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • December 07, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 03, 2018: [Declaration]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 11, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • September 11, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 21, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 02, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 29, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 29, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.