U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Coffelt et al v. Idaho Department of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 23, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 23, 2019: [Relief]
  • January 23, 2019: [Writ]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 15, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 17, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 29, 2018: [Complaint]
  • March 29, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 29, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.