U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Messer v. Magnuson Hospitality Group et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • July 02, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 08, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 29, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 30, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 27, 2018: [Status Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2018: [Docket Annotation - Division Change]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.