U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Cisneros v. Corizon Health Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 13, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 03, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 03, 2018: [Complaint]
  • April 03, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • April 03, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.