U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Rowlette et al v. Mortimer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2021: [Bifurcate]
  • January 04, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 04, 2021: [Expedite]
  • January 04, 2021: [Seal]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Quash]
  • November 04, 2020: [Strike]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2019: [Strike]
  • May 14, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 08, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2018: [Response (generic)]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • October 25, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 25, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • October 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 14, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 13, 2018: [Compel]
  • September 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 22, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 26, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 19, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • June 27, 2018: [Expedite]
  • June 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 26, 2018: [Strike]
  • June 19, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2018: [Litigation Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 29, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 04, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 20, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 05, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 03, 2018: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.