U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Dickinson v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 28, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 01, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • October 01, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 19, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 16, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 16, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • April 13, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 13, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 13, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.