U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00170
  • Case Name: Daines et al v. Matsko et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 08, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 19, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 06, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 06, 2018: [Consent Filed]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.