U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Frantz et al v. Idaho Independent Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 25, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 28, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2019: [Errata]
  • February 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Joinder]
  • January 09, 2019: [Appellees Brief]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 05, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2018: [Dismiss]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Designations of Record]
  • June 27, 2018: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 31, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 15, 2018: [Return Mail]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 30, 2018: [Designations of Record]
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
  • April 30, 2018: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.