U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00209
  • Case Name: GEWALT v. Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Withdraw]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • April 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 12, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 08, 2018: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • June 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 18, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 17, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 15, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 14, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.