U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2020: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 24, 2020: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 17, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 15, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.