U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Byerly v. Koss Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2019: [Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2019: [Declaration]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • October 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • August 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 16, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 16, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.