U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Witcher v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 05, 2018: [Declaration]
  • November 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • September 05, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 24, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 21, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • May 17, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 17, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 17, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 17, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.