U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Votroubek v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 17, 2018: [Waiver]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • May 22, 2018: [Complaint]
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 22, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.