U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00228
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Corral et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Decree of Foreclosure]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • August 30, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 28, 2018: [Judgment - Consent]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • August 23, 2018: [Entry of Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 20, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 02, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 18, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • June 15, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.