U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00312
  • Case Name: Howarth v. Luther
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Return of Exhibits]
  • June 18, 2018: [Return of Exhibits]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 12, 2018: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 11, 2018: [Special Verdict Form]
  • June 11, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 11, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 08, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 08, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 06, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 05, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 05, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • June 04, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 04, 2018: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • June 03, 2018: [Exhibit List]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 31, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.