U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Franklin Energy Storage One, LLC et al. v. Kjellander et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 16, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • March 12, 2020: [Transcript Request]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Administrative Record]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 08, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [Status Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 26, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 26, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 09, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 05, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Statement]
  • September 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 28, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • August 07, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 07, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 07, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 23, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 08, 2018: [Status Report]
  • July 03, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 03, 2018: [Intervene]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 25, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 04, 2018: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.