U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00277
  • Case Name: Michael v. ConAgra Brands Inc Pension Plan for Hourly Production Workers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 10, 2020: [Statement]
  • April 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • December 19, 2019: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 14, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 17, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2018: [More Definite Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 18, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.