U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00278
  • Case Name: Mansfield et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [In Limine]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Response to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2020: [In Limine]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 20, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 20, 2019: [Statement]
  • November 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2019: [Declaration]
  • July 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Objection]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 08, 2019: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Protective Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order]
  • October 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 28, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 30, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 19, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 18, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.