U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00274
  • Case Name: Davis v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2019: [Response (generic)]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Waiver]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 30, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Request]
  • August 08, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Complaint]
  • June 19, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.