U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00279
  • Case Name: Idaho First Bank v. Moore et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 25, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • June 22, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 21, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • June 20, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.