U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00276
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Christian Healthcare Ministries, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 02, 2019: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 30, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 03, 2018: [Litigation Order]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 27, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 20, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 20, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.