U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00281
  • Case Name: Hill et al v. River Run Homeowners Association, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2020: [Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Response to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Status Report]
  • March 18, 2020: [Strike]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 14, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2019: [Declaration]
  • September 12, 2019: [Appendix]
  • September 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 13, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 09, 2019: [Declaration]
  • August 08, 2019: [Declaration]
  • August 08, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • August 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Supplement]
  • July 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • July 12, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • July 09, 2019: [In Limine]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 26, 2019: [Strike]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • February 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Stipulation]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 04, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 23, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 17, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 23, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 20, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 20, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.