U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00280
  • Case Name: Woolf v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 20, 2019: [Receipt]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 20, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • September 20, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 15, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Errata]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 21, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 21, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.