U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00283
  • Case Name: Sentry Select Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 31, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2018: [Litigation Order]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Summons Reissued]
  • June 22, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.