U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00285
  • Case Name: Shoshone Bannock Tribes of the Fort Hall Reservation v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Relief]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 08, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 07, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Clarify]
  • January 31, 2022: [Reconsideration]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Discovery]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 03, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Status Report]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Status Report]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Status Report]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Status Report]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Status Report]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 08, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Stay]
  • March 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 10, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 03, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 14, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 14, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 14, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 08, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 29, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 25, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 12, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2018: [Appendix]
  • October 05, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 19, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 19, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 11, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Statement]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 07, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 26, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.