U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00287
  • Case Name: Larson et al v. Benewah County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 04, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Sealed]
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 29, 2018: [More Definite Statement]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.