U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00286
  • Case Name: Rao et al v. St. Luke's Magic Valley Regional Medical Center, LTD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 17, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 14, 2019: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • May 02, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 02, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2019: [Seal]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 09, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 04, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 04, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 01, 2018: [Litigation Order]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 10, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 05, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.