U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00314
  • Case Name: Delia v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 16, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • November 15, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 18, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • July 18, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 16, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 16, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.