U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00308
  • Case Name: Keller v. Keller
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Compel]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Receipt]
  • April 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Complaint]
  • July 18, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.