U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00333
  • Case Name: Employers Mutual Casualty Company et al v. Plastic Welding and Fabrication, Ltd.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 06, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • December 09, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 02, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 06, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 30, 2019: [Crossclaim]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 18, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 18, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 12, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 11, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Litigation Order]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 12, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • July 25, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.