U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00356
  • Case Name: Weskan Agency, LLC v. CGB Diversified Services, Inc dba Diversified Crop Insurance Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 30, 2018: [Remand to State Court]
  • August 29, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 27, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 27, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 22, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 20, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.