U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00355
  • Case Name: Carew v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 03, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • November 16, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 15, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 15, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 13, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 13, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 13, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.