U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00354
  • Case Name: Bayless v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 14, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
January, 2019
  • January 21, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 04, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • November 15, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 14, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.