U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00357
  • Case Name: Morrison v. CNCPros International, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 29, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • May 29, 2019: [Request for Production of Documents]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 08, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 03, 2019: [Consent Filed]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 23, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 23, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 21, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 17, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 14, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.