U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00352
  • Case Name: Molina et al v. Ada County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 23, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Errata]
  • October 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 22, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 10, 2018: [Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • October 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 25, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • September 25, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • September 06, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 23, 2018: [Receipt]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 15, 2018: [Complaint]
  • August 15, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.