U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00359
  • Case Name: Evans v. Sunshine Minting, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 06, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 29, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 29, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 17, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 05, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 27, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 27, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 12, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2018: [Receipt]
  • August 15, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.