U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00362
  • Case Name: Olsen v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 23, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • April 23, 2019: [Remand]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 05, 2019: [Declaration]
  • April 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 04, 2019: [Administrative Record]
  • February 04, 2019: [Answer to Petition for Review]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 17, 2019: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 29, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 22, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 22, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 20, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 20, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 17, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 17, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.