U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00361
  • Case Name: Sagastume v. RG Transportation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 11, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 01, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 26, 2019: [Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 28, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 30, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 20, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 20, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 17, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 17, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.