U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00364
  • Case Name: Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC v. Twin Falls NSC, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 22, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2018: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 04, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 04, 2018: [Seal]
  • December 04, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 20, 2018: [Receipt]
  • August 20, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 20, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.