U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00358
  • Case Name: K.M.B. v. Modern Ice Equipment and Supply Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 20, 2018: [Docket Annotation - Division Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.