U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00367
  • Case Name: Prather et al v. KST Coating, a unit of The Sherwin-Williams Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Sanctions]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 21, 2019: [Compel]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 23, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 08, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 05, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • September 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Supplement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 21, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 21, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.