U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00370
  • Case Name: Stiner v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 13, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2019: [Declaration]
  • March 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Administrative Record]
  • January 31, 2019: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • January 30, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 05, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 02, 2018: [Receipt]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 22, 2018: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 22, 2018: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.