U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00366
  • Case Name: Veenstra v. Givens et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • February 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 27, 2018: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 16, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • October 12, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • September 07, 2018: [Return Mail]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Complaint]
  • August 23, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 23, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.