U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00417
  • Case Name: Glenwood Snacks, LLC v. Blend, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 15, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • November 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 09, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 28, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2018: [Remand]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 05, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.