U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00416
  • Case Name: Tobias v. Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • March 25, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2020: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 20, 2020: [Response (generic)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Response (generic)]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 11, 2019: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • November 08, 2019: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2019: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • November 01, 2019: [Crossclaim]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 22, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 20, 2019: [Exclude]
  • September 12, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Joinder]
  • July 10, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 16, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 14, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • March 20, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2019: [Crossclaim]
  • March 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 10, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Answer to Crossclaim]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 25, 2018: [Crossclaim]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 09, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2018: [Summons Issued]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.