U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00418
  • Case Name: Vinci v. Regence Blue Shield of Idaho, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 09, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 17, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 17, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 09, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 05, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.