U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00419
  • Case Name: Card v. The Herjavec Group Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Consent Filed]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 30, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 22, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 20, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 20, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 06, 2018: [Litigation Order]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.