U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00404
  • Case Name: Hoak v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • December 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Supplement]
  • December 06, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 02, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 02, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.