U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00414
  • Case Name: Cadue v. Christensen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Receipt]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 02, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 02, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 02, 2018: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 02, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.