U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00421
  • Case Name: Kam v. Trust Financial, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 19, 2019: [Judgment Offer Accepted (Notice of Acceptance)]
  • February 14, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • February 13, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 13, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 10, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 26, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 02, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.